OK HB1048 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - coauthored by McBride
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Eminent domain; prescribing the taking of groundwater rights by eminent domain; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eminent domain; prescribing the taking of groundwater rights by eminent domain; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21Senatecoauthored by McBride
2019-03-19SenateTitle stricken
2019-03-19SenateReported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-05SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-05HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-04HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-04HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 1
2019-03-04HouseAuthored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
2019-03-04HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Sims
2019-03-04HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Energy and Natural Resources
2019-02-06HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Sterling
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback