OK HB1044 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1044
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; relating to unlawful use of cellular telephone; allowing certain mobile telephone use; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; relating to unlawful use of cellular telephone; allowing certain mobile telephone use; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Martinez [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Sen. Allison Ikley-Freeman [D] | Sen. Allison Ikley-Freeman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Approved by Governor 05/16/2019 |
2019-05-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-09 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 |
2019-05-09 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Ikley-Freeman |
2019-05-09 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-12 | House | General Order |
2019-03-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred to Business and Commerce |
2019-02-18 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Martinez |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1044 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019