OK HB1041 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1041
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Soldiers and sailors; veterans registry; modifying definition; effective date.
Title
Soldiers and sailors; veterans registry; modifying definition; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Burns [R] | Sen. Frank Simpson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 100 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-04 | House | General Order |
2019-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Burns |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1041 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed