OK HB1036 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Children; prohibiting guardianship if prospective guardian is the child's parent and parental rights have been terminated; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children; prohibiting guardianship if prospective guardian is the child's parent and parental rights have been terminated; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseApproved by Governor 04/22/2019
2019-04-17HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-17SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-17HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-04-16HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-04-16SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-16SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2019-04-16SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-09SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-20SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-20HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-02-19HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-02-19HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 3
2019-02-19HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Lawson
2019-02-19HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-13HouseAuthored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
2019-02-13HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Walke
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback