OK HB1036 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; requiring Emergency Medical Services to conduct certain reviews; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; requiring Emergency Medical Services to conduct certain reviews; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 78 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | Approved by Governor 05/05/2016 |
2016-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-02 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-28 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 9 |
2016-04-28 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 11 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2015-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 11 |
2015-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-09 | House | General Order |
2015-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Faught |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 2503 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 2504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 2515 | New Code | See Bill Text |