OK HB1036 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; requiring Emergency Medical Services to conduct certain reviews; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; requiring Emergency Medical Services to conduct certain reviews; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2015-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 11 |
2015-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-09 | House | General Order |
2015-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Faught |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 2503 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 2504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 2515 | New Code | See Bill Text |