OK HB1034 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1034
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioners of the Land Office; appropriation; purpose; budgetary limitations; duties and compensation; effective date.
Title
Commissioners of the Land Office; appropriation; purpose; budgetary limitations; duties and compensation; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-06 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Fields |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Osborn (Leslie), Wallace |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1034 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget