OK HB1034 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; authorizing sponsorship of charter schools by certain tribes on certain property; effective date.
Title
Schools; authorizing sponsorship of charter schools by certain tribes on certain property; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Kirby [R] | Sen. Kyle Loveless [R] | Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 18 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 18 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Approved by Governor 05/01/2015 |
2015-04-27 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 19 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Backed up to General Order |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 26 Nays: 16 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Loveless |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 18 Nays: 26 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended, considered and deferred |
2015-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2015-04-21 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2015-02-16 | Senate | coauthored by Billy |
2015-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2015-02-12 | House | General Order |
2015-02-10 | House | Authored by Senator Loveless (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Denney |
2015-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Kirby |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |