OK HB1027 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1027
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; mental health needs of students; including information about violence de-escalation in certain information made available to school districts; effective date.
Title
Schools; mental health needs of students; including information about violence de-escalation in certain information made available to school districts; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2021-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 11 |
2021-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate |
2021-03-02 | House | General Order |
2021-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Ranson |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1027 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Education