OK HB1027 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-26 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-26 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; modifying penalty for failure to comply with the Compulsory Insurance Law; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; modifying penalty for failure to comply with the Compulsory Insurance Law; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Rep. Larry Glenn [D] | Sen. Charles Wyrick [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | SA's received | |
2011-04-26 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-25 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-05 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-14 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2011-02-21 | First Reading | |
2011-02-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-02-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-02-17 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 1 | |
2011-02-17 | General Order | |
2011-02-15 | Placed on Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-15 | Authored by Senator Wyrick (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cox | |
2011-02-15 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Glenn | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |