OK HB1026 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Approved by Governor 04/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; providing for increase in compensation of certain support employees; prescribing amount of increase; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; providing for increase in compensation of certain support employees; prescribing amount of increase; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-03-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03HouseApproved by Governor 04/03/2018
2018-03-29HouseSent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-03-29HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-03-29HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-03-29SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2018-03-29SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9
2018-03-29SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-03-27SenateDirect to Calendar
2018-03-26SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-26HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-26HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-26HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 8
2018-03-26HouseAmended by floor substitute
2018-03-26HouseHouse Rule suspended
2018-03-26HouseGeneral Order
2018-03-26HouseWithdrawn from Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2018-02-05HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Fields
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Wallace, Casey
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback