OK HB1022 | 2013 | Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-04 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]

Summary

Torts; creating the Common Sense Consumption Act; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Torts; creating the Common Sense Consumption Act; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 40 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House: ADVANCE FROM GENERAL ORDER (Y: 55 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House: Common Education Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: Common Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2013-09-03HouseAuthored by Representative Perryman
2013-09-03HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback