OK HB1019 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; requiring any remote seller, marketplace facilitator or referrer with aggregate sales in the state to remit sales tax and report to Tax Commission; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; requiring any remote seller, marketplace facilitator or referrer with aggregate sales in the state to remit sales tax and report to Tax Commission; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - Senate - Senate: ADVANCE (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 8 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 68 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12HouseApproved by Governor 04/10/2018
2018-04-06HouseSent to Governor
2018-04-06SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-04-06HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-04-06HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-04-06SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2018-04-06SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
2018-04-06SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-04-05SenateDirect to Calendar
2018-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-04HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-04-04HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-04-04HouseMotion to reconsider tabled
2018-04-04HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Wallace
2018-04-04HouseEmergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 7
2018-04-04HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Wallace
2018-04-04HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 7
2018-04-04HouseAmended
2018-04-04HouseGeneral Order
2018-04-04HouseWithdrawn from Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2018-02-05HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Fields
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Wallace, Casey
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback