OK HB1018 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Vetoed 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Education; directing school districts to provide age-appropriate instruction about HIV and AIDS; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; directing school districts to provide age-appropriate instruction about HIV and AIDS; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 69 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseVetoed 05/14/2019
2019-05-08HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-08SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-08HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-07HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-07HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 15
2019-05-07HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Roe
2019-05-07HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-29HouseSA's received
2019-04-29SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25SenateEmergency passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 11
2019-04-25SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 18
2019-04-25SenateEmergency clause restored
2019-04-25SenateTitle restored
2019-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-04-24SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Bullard
2019-04-03SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-04-03SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-03SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-03-26SenateReported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
2019-03-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-18SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-18HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-02-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-02-14HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 19
2019-02-14HouseAmended
2019-02-14HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-02-14HouseAuthored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
2019-02-14HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-06HouseCR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative McEntire
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1018&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1018%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1018%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1018%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1018%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1018%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1018%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1018_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1018_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback