OK HB1013 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1013

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Coauthored by Senator Kidd
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Professions and occupations; modifying provisions related to the Nursing Practice Act; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and occupations; modifying provisions related to the Nursing Practice Act; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateCoauthored by Senator Kidd
2018-03-28SenateCoauthored by Senator Smalley
2018-03-27SenateCoauthored by Senator Boggs
2018-03-27SenateCoauthored by Senator Rosino
2018-03-26SenateCoauthored by Senator Murdock
2018-03-26SenateCoauthored by Senator Paxton
2018-03-08SenateCoauthored by Senator Shaw
2018-02-06SenateCoauthored by Senator Jech
2017-03-14SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2017-03-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-07HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-06HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-06HouseMotion expired
2017-03-01HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Cockroft
2017-03-01HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 20
2017-03-01HouseAmended
2017-03-01HouseAuthored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author)
2017-03-01HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Griffith, Mulready, Renegar, Roberts (Sean), Fourkiller, McEntire
2017-03-01HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-08HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Ownbey, Cleveland, Cannaday, West (Kevin), Murdock, Tadlock, Osborn (Leslie), Dunnington, Sanders
2017-02-08HouseCR; Do Pass Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Cockroft
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB1013 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
593531aNew CodeSee Bill Text
5956727Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5956728Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5956729Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5956730Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5956731Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5956732Amended CodeSee Bill Text
595673aNew CodeSee Bill Text
595674aNew CodeSee Bill Text
595674bRepealed CodeSee Bill Text
595675aNew CodeSee Bill Text
632312New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback