OK HB1012 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset; Commission on County Government Personnel Education and Training; recreating the Commission; modifying termination date.
Title
Sunset; Commission on County Government Personnel Education and Training; recreating the Commission; modifying termination date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 18 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 18 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | Approved by Governor 06/04/2015 |
2015-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2015-05-21 | Senate | CCR read |
2015-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2015-05-21 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2015-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2015-05-19 | House | Title restored |
2015-05-19 | House | CCR submitted |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Dahm, Marlatt, Brooks, Jolley, Fry, Pittman, Floyd |
2015-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Administrative Rules |
2015-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Backed up to General Order |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Jolley |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 18 Nays: 27 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2015-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by Leewright |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2015-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-02 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Faught |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |