OK HB1010 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Approved by Governor 03/29/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Approved by Governor 03/29/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; imposing additional tax levy upon cigarettes and cigars; imposing tax on gasoline and diesel fuel; gross production tax; hotel tax.
Title
Revenue and taxation; imposing additional tax levy upon cigarettes and cigars; imposing tax on gasoline and diesel fuel; gross production tax; hotel tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 61 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 61 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Approved by Governor 03/29/2018 |
2018-03-29 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-03-29 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote tabled |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Treat |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2018-03-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-26 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2018-03-26 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Wallace |
2018-03-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 19 |
2018-03-26 | House | Emergency removed |
2018-03-26 | House | Ayes: 61 Nays: 14 |
2018-03-26 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2018-03-26 | House | House Rule suspended |
2018-03-26 | House | General Order |
2018-03-26 | House | Withdrawn from Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-05 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Fields |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace, Casey |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 302 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 402 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 402 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 402 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 500 | 4B | Amended Code | See Bill Text |