OK HB1009 | 2013 | Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Approved by Governor 09/10/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Schools; creating the School Protection Act; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; creating the School Protection Act; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-02 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-09HouseApproved by Governor 09/10/2013
2013-09-09HouseSent to Governor
2013-09-09SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2013-09-09HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2013-09-09HouseReferred for enrollment
2013-09-09SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2013-09-09SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2013-09-09SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2013-09-09Senatecoauthored by Ritze, Wright
2013-09-06SenateDirect to Calendar
2013-09-06SenateSecond Reading
2013-09-05SenateFirst Reading
2013-09-05HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2013-09-05HouseReferred for engrossment
2013-09-05HouseMotion to reconsider tabled
2013-09-05HouseEmergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 3
2013-09-05HouseMotion to reconsider tabled
2013-09-05HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 2
2013-09-05HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Jolley, Shortey
2013-09-05HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Stiles, Cockroft
2013-09-05HouseGeneral Order
2013-09-04HouseSecond Reading, direct to Calendar
2013-09-03HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Sykes
2013-09-03HouseAuthored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author)
2013-09-03HouseAuthored by Representative Shannon
2013-09-03HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
706140Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
706141Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
706142Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
706143Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
706144Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
706145Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
706146Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
706147Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
706148Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
706149Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback