OK HB1007 | 2013 | Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Approved by Governor 09/10/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Public health and safety; modifying peer review information subject to discovery; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; modifying peer review information subject to discovery; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-07 - House - House: Revenue and Tax Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-09HouseApproved by Governor 09/10/2013
2013-09-09HouseSent to Governor
2013-09-09SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2013-09-09HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2013-09-09HouseReferred for enrollment
2013-09-09SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2013-09-09SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2013-09-09SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2013-09-06SenateDirect to Calendar
2013-09-06SenateSecond Reading
2013-09-05SenateFirst Reading
2013-09-05HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2013-09-05HouseReferred for engrossment
2013-09-05HouseMotion to reconsider tabled
2013-09-05HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 15; Ayes: 72 Nays: 18
2013-09-05HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Jolley, Shortey
2013-09-05HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Stiles, Grau, Cockroft, Ritze, Wright
2013-09-05HouseGeneral Order
2013-09-04HouseSecond Reading, direct to Calendar
2013-09-03HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Sykes
2013-09-03HouseAuthored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author)
2013-09-03HouseAuthored by Representative Shannon
2013-09-03HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6311709New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback