OK HB1005 | 2013 | Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Approved by Governor 09/10/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Public health and safety; enacting the Uniform Emergency Volunteer Health Practitioners Act; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; enacting the Uniform Emergency Volunteer Health Practitioners Act; emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-09HouseApproved by Governor 09/10/2013
2013-09-09HouseSent to Governor
2013-09-09SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2013-09-09HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2013-09-09HouseReferred for enrollment
2013-09-09SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2013-09-09Senatecoauthored by Ritze, Wright
2013-09-09SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2013-09-09SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2013-09-06SenateDirect to Calendar
2013-09-06SenateSecond Reading
2013-09-05SenateFirst Reading
2013-09-05HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2013-09-05HouseReferred for engrossment
2013-09-05HouseMotion to reconsider tabled
2013-09-05HouseEmergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1
2013-09-05HouseMotion to reconsider tabled
2013-09-05HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1
2013-09-05HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Jolley, Shortey
2013-09-05HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Stiles, Grau, Cockroft
2013-09-05HouseGeneral Order
2013-09-04HouseSecond Reading, direct to Calendar
2013-09-03HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Sykes
2013-09-03HouseAuthored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author)
2013-09-03HouseAuthored by Representative Shannon
2013-09-03HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6368414Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6368415Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6368416Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6368417Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6368418Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6368419Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6368420Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6368421Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6368422Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6368423Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6368424Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6368425Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6368426Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6368427Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6368428Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6368429Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6368430Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6368431Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6368432Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6368433Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6368434Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6368435Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback