OK HB1002 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1002
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Coauthored by Senator Bullard
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Coauthored by Senator Bullard
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Civil procedure; eliminating time limitations for civil actions based on childhood sexual abuse incidents; effective date.
Title
Civil procedure; eliminating time limitations for civil actions based on childhood sexual abuse incidents; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Bush [R] | Sen. Darrell Weaver [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Jacob Rosecrants [D] |
Rep. Daniel Pae [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Judiciary-Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Judiciary-Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2021-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 6 |
2021-03-11 | House | Amended |
2021-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2021-03-11 | House | Amended |
2021-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, McDugle, Rosecrants |
2021-03-11 | House | General Order |
2021-03-11 | House | House Rule suspended |
2021-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Bush |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1002 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Coauthored by Senator Bullard