OH SJR5 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - Refer to Committee: Rules and Reference
Pending: House Rules and Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - Refer to Committee: Rules and Reference
Pending: House Rules and Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing to amend Section 9 of Article I of the Constitution of the State of Ohio to eliminate the requirement that the amount and conditions of bail be established pursuant to Section 5(b) of Article IV of the Constitution of the State of Ohio, and instead allow the courts to use factors such as public safety, including the seriousness of the offense, and a person's criminal record, the likelihood a person will return to court, and any other factor the General Assembly may prescribe.
Title
CA: Revise factors considered in setting bail
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | House | Refer to Committee: Rules and Reference |
2022-05-26 | House | Introduced |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Judiciary |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Offered |
Subjects
Constitutional Amendment
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment