OH SJR1 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing to amend Sections 4, 20, and 31 of Article II, Section 19 of Article III, and Section 6 of Article IV and to enact Section 20a of Article II of the Constitution of the State of Ohio to establish the Public Office Compensation Commission.
Title
Establishes Public Office Compensation Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Faber [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Senate | Offered |
2015-05-19 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Offered |
2015-04-23 | House | Offered |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Finance |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Offered |