OH SCR7 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-11)
Status: Engrossed on July 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-13 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-13 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To honor Ohio ancestors for the unrivaled
Title
To honor Ohio ancestors for the unrivaled
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-13 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-05-24 | Committee Report | |
2011-04-06 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2011-04-06 | Introduced to House | |
2012-02-09 | Committee Report | |
2011-07-14 | To Veterans Affairs | |
2011-07-14 | Introduced to Senate |