OH SCR6 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-31 - Introduced and Referred to Committee: Public Utilities
Pending: House Public Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-31 - Introduced and Referred to Committee: Public Utilities
Pending: House Public Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To urge the Congress of the United States to grant additional authority to the Federal Communications Commission to stop unwanted robocalls and "call spoofing" and to urge the Commission to educate the public on how to report illegal telephone calls.
Title
Urge Congress to prohibit robocalls and call spoofing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: Public Utilities |
2020-06-25 | House | Offered |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Reported: Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Offered |