OH SCR31 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To recognize the outstanding service of the 65th
Title
To recognize the outstanding service of the 65th
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-03-13 | Committee Report | |
2014-01-28 | To Public Safety, Local Government & Veteran Affairs | |
2014-01-28 | Introduced to House | |
2014-03-26 | To Military and Veterans Affairs | |
2014-03-26 | Introduced to Senate |