OH SCR23 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-2)
Status: Passed on December 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-05 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-2)
Status: Passed on December 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-05 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To reassert the principles of federalism found throughout the Constitution of the United States of America and embodied in the Tenth Amendment, to notify Congress to limit and end certain mandates, and to insist that federal legislation contravening the Tenth Amendment be prohibited or repealed.
Title
Reassert principles of federalism and enforce Tenth Amendment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - House Adopted (Y: 62 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - House Adopted (Y: 62 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-05 | House | Adopted |
2018-12-05 | House | Reported: Federalism and Interstate Relations |
2018-11-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: Federalism and Interstate Relations |
2018-07-02 | House | Offered |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Reported: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Offered |