OH SCR14 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Introduced and Referred to Committee: Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Introduced and Referred to Committee: Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To urge Congress to make changes to the Fair Labor Standards Act to allow a person under 16 years of age to be employed between 7 p.m. and 9 p.m. during the school year.
Title
Urge Congress to change Fair Labor Standards Act re: minors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: Commerce and Labor |
2022-03-08 | House | Offered |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported: Workforce and Higher Education |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Workforce and Higher Education |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Offered |