OH SB9 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-03 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-03 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 5747.98 and to enact sections 122.85 and 5747.66 of the Revised Code to authorize income tax credits for investments in motion pictures produced in Ohio.
Title
To authorize income tax credits for investments in motion pictures produced in Ohio.
Sponsors
Rep. John Carey [R] | Sen. Kevin Coughlin [R] | Sen. Bob Gibbs [R] | Sen. Karen Gillmor [R] |
Rep. Timothy Grendell [R] | Sen. Jim Hughes [R] | Rep. Thomas Patton [R] | Sen. Kirk Schuring [R] |
Sen. Mark Wagoner [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2009-02-26 | Committee Report | |
2009-02-10 | To Ways & Means & Economic Development | |
2009-02-10 | Introduced to House | |
2009-03-04 | To Ways & Means | |
2009-03-04 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
1 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 22 | 85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 66 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 47 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |