OH SB86 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 57-31)
Status: Enrolled on June 20 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Conference managers: Reps. - Green, Anielski, Holmes: Conference Committee on SB 86
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4501.21 and 4503.772 and to enact sections 5.036, 5.074, 5.2315, 5.243, 5.244, 5.245, 5.2512, 5.2571, 5.262, 5.263, 5.264, 5.481, 5.49, 5.50, 4503.567, 4503.595, 4503.723, 4503.734, 4503.765, 4503.872, 4503.909, 4503.941, 4503.952, 4503.953, 4503.954, 4503.955, 5534.152, 5534.39, 5534.403, 5534.404, 5534.481, 5534.492, 5534.493, 5534.77, 5534.805, 5534.806, 5534.808, 5534.81, 5534.82, 5534.83, 5534.85, 5534.891, 5534.892, 5534.96, and 5534.98 of the Revised Code to designate multiple memorial highways and bridges, to create multiple nonstandard license plates, to create multiple special designations, and to designate John Glenn's childhood home as a state historic site.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Ohio National Missing Children's Day

Sponsors

Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]
Sen. Michael Skindell [D]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Sen. Louis Terhar [R]
Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]
Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. William Coley [R]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]
Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]
Sen. Kris Jordan [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Gayle Manning [R]
Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]
Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Jason Wilson [D]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]
Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. John Becker [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Brian Hill [R]
Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]
Rep. Niraj Antani [R]Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]
Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]
Rep. Jack Cera [D]Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]Rep. Hearcel Craig [D]Rep. Jonathan Dever [R]
Rep. Keith Faber [R]Rep. Theresa Gavarone [R]Rep. Anne Gonzales [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]
Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]
Rep. Al Landis [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. David Leland [D]
Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Nathan Manning [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Eugene Miller [D]
Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]
Rep. Wes Retherford [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Kristina Roegner [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]
Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]
Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]Rep. Ron Young [R]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]

Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04HouseConference managers: Reps. - Green, Anielski, Holmes: Conference Committee on SB 86
2018-12-03SenateConference managers: Sens. - Uecker, Hackett, Thomas: Conference Committee on SB 86
2018-11-28HouseInsist on amendments; asks for committee of conference
2018-11-14SenateRefused to concur in House amendments
2018-06-20HousePassed
2018-06-13HouseReported - Substitute: State and Local Government
2018-06-05HouseRe-referred: State and Local Government
2018-05-22HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2017-11-01HouseReported - Amended: State and Local Government
2017-09-12HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2017-06-20HouseIntroduced
2017-06-15SenatePassed
2017-05-30SenateReported: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2017-03-07SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2017-03-02SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4501Amended CodeCitation Text
450121Amended CodeCitation Text
4503Amended CodeCitation Text
4503567New CodeSee Bill Text
4503595New CodeSee Bill Text
4503723New CodeSee Bill Text
4503734New CodeSee Bill Text
4503765New CodeSee Bill Text
4503772Amended CodeCitation Text
4503872New CodeSee Bill Text
4503909New CodeSee Bill Text
4503941New CodeSee Bill Text
4503952New CodeSee Bill Text
4503953New CodeSee Bill Text
4503954New CodeSee Bill Text
4503955New CodeSee Bill Text
55New CodeSee Bill Text
5534New CodeSee Bill Text
5534152New CodeSee Bill Text
553439New CodeSee Bill Text
5534403New CodeSee Bill Text
5534404New CodeSee Bill Text
5534481New CodeSee Bill Text
5534492New CodeSee Bill Text
5534493New CodeSee Bill Text
553477New CodeSee Bill Text
5534805New CodeSee Bill Text
5534806New CodeSee Bill Text
5534808New CodeSee Bill Text
553481New CodeSee Bill Text
553482New CodeSee Bill Text
553483New CodeSee Bill Text
553485New CodeSee Bill Text
5534891New CodeSee Bill Text
5534892New CodeSee Bill Text
553496New CodeSee Bill Text
553498New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA132-SB-86
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb86/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb86/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb86/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb86/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb86/RCH/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb86/RRH/06?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb86/PH/07?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA132-SB-86

Bill Comments

feedback