OH SB85 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To enact sections 9.29, 735.054, 6101.161, 6103.101, 6115.201, and 6119.101 of the Revised Code to authorize certain political subdivisions to contract for engineering, repair, sustainability, water quality management, and maintenance of a water storage tank through a professional service contract under specified conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To authorize certain political subdivisions to contract for engineering, repair, sustainability, water quality management, and maintenance of a water storage tank through a professional service contract under specified conditions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-30 Effective Date
2010-03-31 Governor' Action
2010-04-10 End of 10-day period
2010-03-30 Sent to Governor
2010-03-24 Concurrence
2009-06-24 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2009-06-17 Committee Report - S
2009-03-24 To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs
2009-03-24 Introduced to House
2010-03-24 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2010-01-21 Committee Report
2009-06-25 To State Government
2009-06-25 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
61New CodeSee Bill Text
6101New CodeSee Bill Text
6101161New CodeSee Bill Text
6103New CodeSee Bill Text
6103101New CodeSee Bill Text
6115New CodeSee Bill Text
6115201New CodeSee Bill Text
6119New CodeSee Bill Text
6119101New CodeSee Bill Text
7New CodeSee Bill Text
735New CodeSee Bill Text
735054New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback