OH SB84 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-01 - Refer to Committee: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Public Safety
Pending: House Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-01 - Refer to Committee: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Public Safety
Pending: House Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4781.40, 5301.072, and 5311.191 and to enact section 5321.131 of the Revised Code to prohibit manufactured homes park operators, condominium associations, neighborhood associations, and landlords from restricting the display of Ohio flags and blue star banners, gold star banners, and other service flags, and to prohibit manufactured homes park operators and landlords from restricting the display of the United States flag.
Title
Prohibits landlords from restricting flag display
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-01 | House | Refer to Committee: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Public Safety |
2015-06-26 | House | Introduced |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: State and Local Government |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Housing and Real Property
Housing and Real Property : Condominiums and Homeowner Associations
Housing and Real Property : Landlords and Tenants
Military and Veterans
Housing and Real Property : Condominiums and Homeowner Associations
Housing and Real Property : Landlords and Tenants
Military and Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 81 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 81 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
53 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
53 | 01 | 072 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
53 | 11 | 191 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
53 | 21 | 131 | New Code | See Bill Text |