OH SB80 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Effective 9/30/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3501.01, 3505.03, 3505.04, and 3513.257 of the Revised Code to require certain judicial candidates to appear on the ballot with a party designation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require certain judicial candidates have party ballot designation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 52 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-30 Effective 9/30/21
2021-06-25HousePassed
2021-06-17HouseReported: Government Oversight
2021-05-04HouseRefer to Committee: Government Oversight
2021-04-21SenatePassed
2021-04-21SenateReported: Local Government and Elections
2021-02-24SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government and Elections
2021-02-23SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
350101Amended CodeCitation Text
350503Amended CodeCitation Text
350504Amended CodeCitation Text
3513257Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-80
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb80/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb80/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb80/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb80/RH/03/sb80_03_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb80/PH/04/sb80_04_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb80/EN/05/sb80_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15774&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16018&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16368&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16366&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16416&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16861&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17098&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17099&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17217&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17249&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17278&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17291&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-80

Bill Comments

feedback