OH SB80 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5.246 of the Revised Code to designate the last week of September as "Diaper Need Awareness Week."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Diaper Need Awareness Week

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30HouseIntroduced
2020-09-23SenatePassed
2020-09-02SenateReported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-03-12SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-03-06SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback