OH SB79 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on October 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on October 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 9.239, 9.55, 101.37, 101.39, 107.12, 109.57, 109.572, 109.71, 109.77, 109.86, 117.102, 121.02, 121.03, 121.32, 121.36, 121.37, 123.01, 124.11, 124.23, 124.241, 124.27, 124.38, 124.381, 125.602, 125.603, 126.32, 127.16, 135.801, 135.802, 135.803, 140.01, 140.03, 140.05, 145.012, 145.297, 154.17, 154.20, 173.03, 305.14, 307.10, 307.86, 309.10, 319.16, 325.19, 329.06, 1751.01, 1751.02, 2108.521, 2109.01, 2109.04, 2111.01, 2111.02, 2111.10, 2133.25, 2151.011, 2151.421, 2903.33, 2919.271, 2921.36, 2921.38, 2930.061, 2935.03, 2945.37, 2945.371, 2945.38, 2945.39, 2945.40, 2945.401, 2967.22, 3109.18, 3301.07, 3301.15, 3301.52, 3301.53, 3301.55, 3301.57, 3301.58, 3304.231, 3313.65, 3313.715, 3314.022, 3314.99, 3317.01, 3317.02, 3317.024, 3317.03, 3317.032, 3317.05, 3317.051, 3317.052, 3317.07, 3317.15, 3317.20, 3319.22, 3319.99, 3323.01, 3323.02, 3323.021, 3323.03, 3323.04, 3323.05, 3323.07, 3323.09, 3323.091, 3323.12, 3323.141, 3323.142, 3323.31, 3326.99, 3501.01, 3701.78, 3701.93, 3701.932, 3701.933, 3705.36, 3721.01, 3721.14, 3722.01, 3727.01, 3735.58, 4109.06, 4115.32, 4141.29, 4511.21, 4511.75, 4723.071, 5101.35, 5101.46, 5101.611, 5103.02, 5103.13, 5104.08, 5107.24, 5111.042, 5111.151, 5111.202, 5111.203, 5111.211, 5111.251, 5111.291, 5111.65, 5111.677, 5111.709, 5111.87, 5111.871, 5111.872, 5111.873, 5111.874, 5111.875, 5111.876, 5111.8710, 5111.915, 5112.30, 5112.32, 5112.37, 5112.371, 5119.16, 5119.221, 5119.51, 5120.07, 5120.135, 5121.01, 5121.02, 5121.03, 5121.04, 5121.05, 5121.051, 5121.06, 5121.061, 5121.07, 5121.08, 5121.09, 5121.10, 5121.11, 5121.12, 5123.01, 5123.012, 5123.02, 5123.021, 5123.03, 5123.031, 5123.032, 5123.033, 5123.04, 5123.042, 5123.043, 5123.044, 5123.046, 5123.047, 5123.048, 5123.049, 5123.0410, 5123.0411, 5123.0412, 5123.0413, 5123.0414, 5123.0415, 5123.0416, 5123.0417, 5123.05, 5123.051, 5123.06, 5123.07, 5123.08, 5123.081, 5123.082, 5123.083, 5123.09, 5123.091, 5123.092, 5123.093, 5123.10, 5123.11, 5123.12, 5123.122, 5123.13, 5123.14, 5123.15, 5123.16, 5123.161, 5123.162, 5123.163, 5123.164, 5123.166, 5123.167, 5123.168, 5123.169, 5123.17, 5123.171, 5123.172, 5123.18, 5123.181, 5123.19, 5123.191, 5123.194, 5123.195, 5123.196, 5123.198, 5123.21, 5123.211, 5123.22, 5123.221, 5123.23, 5123.24, 5123.25, 5123.26, 5123.27, 5123.28, 5123.29, 5123.30, 5123.31, 5123.33, 5123.34, 5123.35, 5123.351, 5123.352, 5123.36, 5123.37, 5123.371, 5123.372, 5123.373, 5123.374, 5123.375, 5123.38, 5123.40, 5123.41, 5123.42, 5123.421, 5123.43, 5123.44, 5123.45, 5123.451, 5123.47, 5123.50, 5123.51, 5123.52, 5123.53, 5123.54, 5123.541, 5123.542, 5123.55, 5123.56, 5123.57, 5123.58, 5123.59, 5123.60, 5123.601, 5123.602, 5123.604, 5123.61, 5123.611, 5123.612, 5123.613, 5123.614, 5123.63, 5123.64, 5123.65, 5123.71, 5123.711, 5123.72, 5123.73, 5123.74, 5123.75, 5123.76, 5123.801, 5123.81, 5123.811, 5123.82, 5123.85, 5123.86, 5123.89, 5123.90, 5123.96, 5126.01, 5126.02, 5126.028, 5126.029, 5126.0210, 5126.0211, 5126.0212, 5126.0213, 5126.0214, 5126.0215, 5126.0216, 5126.0217, 5126.0218, 5126.0219, 5126.0220, 5126.0221, 5126.0222, 5126.0223, 5126.0224, 5126.0225, 5126.0226, 5126.0227, 5126.0228, 5126.0229, 5126.03, 5126.031, 5126.032, 5126.033, 5126.034, 5126.037, 5126.038, 5126.04, 5126.041, 5126.042, 5126.044, 5126.045, 5126.046, 5126.05, 5126.051, 5126.052, 5126.054, 5126.055, 5126.056, 5126.058, 5126.059, 5126.0510, 5126.0511, 5126.0512, 5126.06, 5126.07, 5126.071, 5126.08, 5126.081, 5126.082, 5126.09, 5126.10, 5126.11, 5126.12, 5126.121, 5126.13, 5126.14, 5126.15, 5126.18, 5126.19, 5126.20, 5126.201, 5126.21, 5126.22, 5126.221, 5126.23, 5126.24, 5126.25, 5126.251, 5126.252, 5126.253, 5126.254, 5126.26, 5126.27, 5126.28, 5126.281, 5126.29, 5126.30, 5126.31, 5126.311, 5126.313, 5126.33, 5126.331, 5126.333, 5126.34, 5126.36, 5126.40, 5126.41, 5126.42, 5126.43, 5126.45, 5126.46, 5126.47, 5126.49, 5126.50, 5126.54, 5126.55, 5126.57, 5126.58, 5126.59, 5126.61, 5126.62, 5126.99, 5139.08, 5139.34, 5145.18, 5153.16, 5153.99, 5511.03, 5543.011, 5705.091, 5705.14, 5705.191, 5705.222, 5705.28, 5705.44, 5735.142, 5815.28, and 5815.35; to amend section 5123.011 as it results from Am. Sub. S.B. 156 of the 119th General Assembly; to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 5123.011 (5123.013) as it results from Am. Sub. S.B. 285 of the 121st General Assembly; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 5126.028 (5126.021), 5126.029 (5126.022), 5126.0210 (5126.023), 5126.0211 (5126.024), 5126.0212 (5126.025), 5126.0213 (5126.026), 5126.0214 (5126.027), 5126.0215 (5126.028), 5126.0216 (5126.029), 5126.0217 (5126.0210), 5126.0218 (5126.0211), 5126.0219 (5126.0212), 5126.0220 (5126.0213), 5126.0221 (5126.0214), 5126.0222 (5126.0215), 5126.0223 (5126.0216), 5126.0224 (5126.0217), 5126.0225 (5126.0218), 5126.0226 (5126.0219), 5126.0227 (5126.0220), 5126.0228 (5126.0221), and 5126.0229 (5126.0222); to enact sections 5123.014 and 5126.011; to repeal sections 5126.021, 5126.022, 5126.023, 5126.024, 5126.025, 5126.026, and 5126.027 of the Revised Code; to amend Sections 209.60.40, 209.60.50, and 501.40 of H.B. 496 of the 127th General Assembly, to amend Section 201.60.30 of H.B. 496 of the 127th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to amend Sections 231.30.10, 231.30.20, and 253.10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 562 of the 127th General Assembly, to amend Section 231.20.30 of Am. Sub. H.B. 562 of the 127th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, and to amend Section 4 of Am. Sub. H.B. 516 of the 125th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to change the name of the Department of Mental Retardation and Developmental Disabilities to the Department of Developmental Disabilities and the name of county boards of mental retardation and developmental disabilities to county boards of developmental disabilities, to make similar name changes for the Joint Council on Mental Retardation and Developmental Disabilities, the Mental Retardation and Developmental Disabilities Developmental Center Closure Commission, and certain state and county funds, and to repeal obsolete law regarding multi-county boards of mental retardation and developmental disabilities.
Title
; to amend Sections 209.60.40, 209.60.50, and 501.40 of H.B. 496 of the 127th General Assembly, to amend Section 201.60.30 of H.B. 496 of the 127th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to amend Sections 231.30.10, 231.30.20, and 253.10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 562 of the 127th General Assembly, to amend Section 231.20.30 of Am. Sub. H.B. 562 of the 127th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, and to amend Section 4 of Am. Sub. H.B. 516 of the 125th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to change the name of the Department of Mental Retardation and Developmental Disabilities to the Department of Developmental Disabilities and the name of county boards of mental retardation and developmental disabilities to county boards of developmental disabilities, to make similar name changes for the Joint Council on Mental Retardation and Developmental Disabilities, the Mental Retardation and Developmental Disabilities Developmental Center Closure Commission, and certain state and county funds, and to repeal obsolete law regarding multi-county boards of mental retardation and developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2009-06-17 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-06 | Effective Date | |
2009-07-07 | Governor' Action | |
2009-07-11 | End of 10-day period | |
2009-06-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-06-17 | Concurrence | |
2009-04-22 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2009-04-21 | Committee Report | |
2009-03-11 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2009-03-11 | Introduced to House | |
2009-06-10 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2009-06-10 | Committee Report - S | |
2009-04-23 | To Local Government/Public Administration | |
2009-04-23 | Introduced to Senate |