OH SB77 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Effective 3/12/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5.52 of the Revised Code to designate June 12 as "Women Veterans' Day."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Women Veterans' Day

Sponsors

Rep. Niraj Antani [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Gil Blair [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]
Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]
Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Jack Cera [D]Rep. Randi Clites [D]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]
Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]
Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]
Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]
Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Don Jones [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]
Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. George Lang [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]
Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Don Manning [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]
Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joe Miller [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]
Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]
Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phil Robinson [D]
Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]
Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]
Rep. Todd Smith [R]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]
Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]
Rep. Thomas West [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]

Roll Calls

2019-11-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Effective 3/12/20
2019-11-06HousePassed
2019-05-23HouseReported: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs
2019-04-16HouseRefer to Committee: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs
2019-04-12HouseIntroduced
2019-04-10SenatePassed
2019-04-09SenateReported: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2019-03-06SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback