OH SB71 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-16)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective 3/23/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-16)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective 3/23/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the versions of sections 340.03 and 340.041 of the Revised Code scheduled to take effect on July 1, 2017, to allow a board of alcohol, drug addiction, and mental health services to authorize its executive director to execute contracts valued at $25,000 or less without the board's prior approval and to allow temporary cash transfers to the Targeting Addiction Assistance Fund.
Title
Allow director of ADAMHS board to execute contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Effective 3/23/18 | |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2017-12-05 | House | Passed |
2017-11-30 | House | Reported - Amended: State and Local Government |
2017-10-10 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2017-10-02 | House | Introduced |
2017-09-27 | Senate | Passed |
2017-09-27 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced |