OH SB62 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective 3/23/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective 3/23/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.236 of the Revised Code to designate July 8 as "Harrison Dillard Day."
Title
Designate Harrison Dillard Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Effective 3/23/18 | |
2017-12-13 | House | Passed |
2017-09-20 | House | Reported: State and Local Government |
2017-05-16 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2017-05-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported: Government Oversight and Reform |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |