OH SB6 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-12 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-12 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 5747.70 of the Revised Code to increase the maximum income tax deduction for college savings contributions to $10,000 annually for each beneficiary, to create the Joint Committee on Ohio College Affordability, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Increases maximum tax deduction for college savings plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2015-05-07 | House | Introduced |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reported: Ways and Means |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |