OH SB58 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-08 - Effective 3/23/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 3721.99 and to enact sections 3721.60, 3721.61, 3721.62, 3721.63, 3721.64, 3721.65, 3721.66, 3721.67, and 3721.68 of the Revised Code to permit a resident of a long-term care facility to conduct electronic monitoring of the resident's room and to designate this act as Esther's Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enact Esther's Law re: long-term care facility room monitoring

Sponsors

Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Rep. Adam Bird [R]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]
Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Gary Click [R]
Rep. Rodney Creech [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]
Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]Rep. Thomas Hall [R]
Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Latyna Humphrey [D]
Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Mark Johnson [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]
Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. David Leland [D]
Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]
Rep. Derek Merrin [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joseph Miller [D]Rep. Kevin Miller [R]
Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Sharon Ray [R]
Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phillip Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]
Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]
Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Monique Smith [D]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]
Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]Rep. Daniel Troy [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]
Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]
Rep. Tom Young [R]Rep. Paul Zeltwanger [R]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]
Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]
Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]
Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]
Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2021-11-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-08 Effective 3/23/22
2021-12-08SenateConcurred in House amendments
2021-11-18HousePassed
2021-11-01HouseReported - Substitute: Families, Aging, and Human Services
2021-06-10HouseRefer to Committee: Families, Aging, and Human Services
2021-05-19SenatePassed
2021-05-19SenateReported - Substitute: Health
2021-02-10SenateRefer to Committee: Health
2021-02-09SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
372160New CodeSee Bill Text
372161New CodeSee Bill Text
372162New CodeSee Bill Text
372163New CodeSee Bill Text
372164New CodeSee Bill Text
372165New CodeSee Bill Text
372166New CodeSee Bill Text
372167New CodeSee Bill Text
372168New CodeSee Bill Text
372199Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-58
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb58/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb58/RS/01/sb58_01_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb58/PS/02/sb58_02_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb58/RH/03/sb58_03_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb58/PH/04/sb58_04_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb58/EN/05/sb58_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15693&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15802&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16749&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16753&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16776&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16782&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17714&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17746&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17762&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17895&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18050&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18131&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-58

Bill Comments

feedback