OH SB58 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-11)
Status: Passed on September 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 109.561, 1547.11, 2919.25, 2929.13, 2933.82, 4506.17, 4511.19, 4765.38, and 4765.39 and to enact section 2927.15 of the Revised Code to prohibit a person from collecting any bodily substance of another person without privilege or consent to do so, to correct erroneous cross-references in provisions enacted in Am. Sub. H.B. 280 of the 127th General Assembly regarding increased penalties for domestic violence committed against a pregnant woman, to permit emergency medical technicians-intermediate and emergency medical technicians-paramedic to withdraw blood for the purposes of the watercraft or vehicle OVI law or the commercial motor vehicle law, to require the office of the attorney general to administer and conduct preservation of biological evidence training, and to add a representative from the Division of Criminal Justice Services to the Biological Evidence Task Force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To prohibit a person from collecting any bodily substance of another person without privilege or consent to do so, to correct erroneous cross-references in provisions enacted in Am. Sub. H.B. 280 of the 127th General Assembly regarding increased penalties for domestic violence committed against a pregnant woman, to permit emergency medical technicians-intermediate and emergency medical technicians-paramedic to withdraw blood for the purposes of the watercraft or vehicle OVI law or the commercial motor vehicle law, to require the office of the attorney general to administer and conduct preservation of biological evidence training, and to add a representative from the Division of Criminal Justice Services to the Biological Evidence Task Force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-17 Effective Date
2010-06-18 Governor' Action
2010-06-21 End of 10-day period
2010-06-09 Sent to Governor
2010-06-02 Concurrence
2009-04-21 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2009-03-26 Committee Report - S
2009-02-26 To Judiciary Criminal Justice
2009-02-26 Introduced to House
2010-05-26 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2010-05-26 Committee Report - S
2009-04-22 To Criminal Justice
2009-04-22 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
109Amended CodeCitation Text
109561Amended CodeCitation Text
15Amended CodeCitation Text
1547Amended CodeCitation Text
154711Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2919Amended CodeCitation Text
291925Amended CodeCitation Text
2927New CodeSee Bill Text
292715New CodeSee Bill Text
2929Amended CodeCitation Text
292913Amended CodeCitation Text
2933Amended CodeCitation Text
293382Amended CodeCitation Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4506Amended CodeCitation Text
450617Amended CodeCitation Text
4511Amended CodeCitation Text
451119Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4765Amended CodeCitation Text
476538Amended CodeCitation Text
476539Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback