OH SB58 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2007 - 100% progression
Action: 2007-08-30 - Effective Date

Summary

To amend sections 4729.01, 4729.17, and 4729.41 of the Revised Code to modify the authority of pharmacists to administer immunizations and to make changes in certain voting procedures of the State Board of Pharmacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacists-immunizations/board procedure

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2007-08-30 Effective Date
2007-05-31 Governor Action
2007-06-04 End of 10-day Period
2007-05-23 Sent to Governor
2007-03-20 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2007-03-08 Committee Report
2007-02-20 To Health, Human Services, & Aging
2007-02-20 Introduced to House
2007-05-16 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2007-05-10 Committee Report
2007-03-21 To Health
2007-03-21 Introduced to Senate

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback