OH SB57 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-24)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective 8/3/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-24)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective 8/3/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 5709.121, 5709.91, and 5715.19 of the Revised Code to modify the law regarding property tax exemptions and procedures and to authorize COVID-19-related property tax valuation complaints.
Title
Exempt certain housing from property taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Effective 8/3/21 | |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2021-03-03 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reported: Ways and Means |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 09 | 121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | 91 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 15 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |