OH SB57 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-27 - Effective 12/27/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5.291 of the Revised Code to designate the seventeenth day of May as "Diffuse Intrinsic Pontine Glioma Awareness Day."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Diffuse Intrinsic Pontine Glioma Awareness Day

Sponsors

Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. William Coley [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]
Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]
Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Sen. Troy Balderson [R]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]
Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Sen. Gayle Manning [R]
Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Michael Skindell [D]
Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]
Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Jason Wilson [D]Rep. Theresa Gavarone [R]Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]
Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. Mike Duffey [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]
Rep. Sarah LaTourette [R]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]
Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]
Rep. Hearcel Craig [D]Rep. Keith Faber [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]
Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Terry Johnson [R]
Rep. Al Landis [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]
Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]
Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]
Rep. Martin Sweeney [D]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Rep. Ron Young [R]

Roll Calls

2017-09-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-27 Effective 12/27/17
2017-09-20HousePassed
2017-05-01HouseReported: Health
2017-03-29HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2017-03-16HouseIntroduced
2017-03-15SenatePassed
2017-03-08SenateReported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2017-02-22SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2017-02-15SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback