OH SB52 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 48-27)
Status: Passed on January 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - Effective 1/24/20 - Appropriations effective October 25, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3505.21, 5502.011, 5923.01, 5923.02, 5923.03, 5923.12, 5923.37, and 5924.01 and to enact sections 111.09, 3505.331, 5922.01, 5922.02, 5922.03, 5922.04, 5922.05, 5922.06, 5922.07, and 5922.08 of the Revised Code to create the civilian cyber security reserve forces, to make the Secretary of State a member of the Homeland Security Advisory Council, to require the Secretary of State to appoint a chief information security officer, to require the boards of elections to audit election results, and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improve information integrity and security

Sponsors

Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Gil Blair [D]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]
Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]
Rep. Randi Clites [D]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]
Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]
Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]
Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. David Leland [D]
Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Don Manning [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]
Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Joe Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]
Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]
Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phil Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]
Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Todd Smith [R]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]
Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Sen. Dave Burke [R]
Sen. William Coley [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]
Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]
Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]
Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]
Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]

Roll Calls

2019-10-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-24 Effective 1/24/20 - Appropriations effective October 25, 2019
2019-10-09SenateConcurred in House amendments
2019-10-02HousePassed - Amended
2019-06-19HouseReported - Substitute: Finance
2019-06-05HouseRe-referred: Finance
2019-06-04HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2019-05-28HouseReported: Transportation and Public Safety
2019-04-16HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2019-04-10HouseIntroduced
2019-04-03SenatePassed
2019-04-02SenateReported - Substitute: Government Oversight and Reform
2019-02-20SenateRefer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1New CodeSee Bill Text
111New CodeSee Bill Text
11109New CodeSee Bill Text
35Amended CodeCitation Text
3505Amended CodeCitation Text
350521Amended CodeCitation Text
3505331New CodeSee Bill Text
55Amended CodeCitation Text
5502Amended CodeCitation Text
5502011Amended CodeCitation Text
59Amended CodeCitation Text
5922New CodeSee Bill Text
592201New CodeSee Bill Text
592202New CodeSee Bill Text
592203New CodeSee Bill Text
592204New CodeSee Bill Text
592205New CodeSee Bill Text
592206New CodeSee Bill Text
592207New CodeSee Bill Text
592208New CodeSee Bill Text
5923Amended CodeCitation Text
592301Amended CodeCitation Text
592302Amended CodeCitation Text
592303Amended CodeCitation Text
592312Amended CodeCitation Text
592337Amended CodeCitation Text
5924Amended CodeCitation Text
592401Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA133-SB-52
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb52/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb52/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb52/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb52/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb52/RCH/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb52/RH/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb52/PH/06?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb52/EN/07?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA133-SB-52

Bill Comments

feedback