OH SB5 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-14)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Effective 6/30/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-14)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Effective 6/30/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4755.48 and to enact sections 4755.57 and 4755.571 of the Revised Code to enter into the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact.
Title
Enter into Physical Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Effective 6/30/21 | |
2021-03-17 | House | Passed |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported: Health |
2021-02-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported: Health |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Health and Human Services
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 55 | 48 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 55 | 57 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 55 | 571 | New Code | See Bill Text |