OH SB5 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 54-24)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Effective 3/12/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 9.78, 2907.22, and 2953.25 of the Revised Code to amend the penalties for promoting prostitution, to set a uniform fee for a certificate of qualification for employment, to require licensing agencies to provide additional information on the use of certificates of qualification for employment and certificates of achievement and employability, and to create a rebuttable presumption for issuance of a certificate of qualification for employment under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change penalties for promoting prostitution

Sponsors

Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Gil Blair [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]
Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]
Rep. Randi Clites [D]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]
Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]
Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Don Jones [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]
Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. Don Manning [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]
Rep. Joe Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]
Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]
Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]
Rep. Todd Smith [R]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]
Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]
Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. William Coley [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. John Eklund [R]
Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Brian Hill [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]
Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]
Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]
Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]
Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]
Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2019-10-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Effective 3/12/20
2019-11-06SenateConcurred in House amendments
2019-10-23HousePassed
2019-10-11HouseReported - Substitute: Criminal Justice
2019-03-19HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced
2019-03-06SenatePassed
2019-03-06SenateReported: Judiciary
2019-02-13SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2907Amended CodeCitation Text
290722Amended CodeCitation Text
2953Amended CodeCitation Text
295325Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback