OH SB5 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-21 - Recommitted: Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-21 - Recommitted: Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4123.01, 4123.026, and 4123.46 of the Revised Code to make peace officers, firefighters, and emergency medical workers diagnosed with post-traumatic stress disorder arising from employment without an accompanying physical injury eligible for compensation and benefits under Ohio's Workers' Compensation Law.
Title
Extends workers' compensation to certain individuals with PTSD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-21 | Senate | Recommitted: Finance |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Finance |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Re-referred: Finance |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported: Transportation, Commerce and Labor |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Commerce : Insurance
Employment
Employment : Workers' Compensation
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Retirement
Employment
Employment : Workers' Compensation
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Retirement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
41 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
41 | 23 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 026 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 46 | Amended Code | Citation Text |