OH SB49 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Effective 9/30/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact sections 4703.20, 4703.201, 4703.202, 4703.203, 4703.204, 4703.205, 4703.206, 4703.54, 4703.541, 4703.542, 4703.543, 4703.544, 4703.545, 4703.546, 4733.30, 4733.301, 4733.302, 4733.303, 4733.304, 4733.305, and 4733.306 of the Revised Code to establish a payment assurance program for registered design professionals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create payment assurance program for design professionals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-30 Effective 9/30/21
2021-06-23SenateConcurred in House amendments
2021-06-17SenateAmendments laid over under the rule
2021-06-16HousePassed
2021-06-10HouseReported - Substitute: Commerce and Labor
2021-05-11HouseRefer to Committee: Commerce and Labor
2021-05-05SenatePassed
2021-04-21SenateReported: Judiciary
2021-02-10SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2021-02-04SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
470320New CodeSee Bill Text
4703201New CodeSee Bill Text
4703202New CodeSee Bill Text
4703203New CodeSee Bill Text
4703204New CodeSee Bill Text
4703205New CodeSee Bill Text
4703206New CodeSee Bill Text
470354New CodeSee Bill Text
4703541New CodeSee Bill Text
4703542New CodeSee Bill Text
4703543New CodeSee Bill Text
4703544New CodeSee Bill Text
4703545New CodeSee Bill Text
4703546New CodeSee Bill Text
473330New CodeSee Bill Text
4733301New CodeSee Bill Text
4733302New CodeSee Bill Text
4733303New CodeSee Bill Text
4733304New CodeSee Bill Text
4733305New CodeSee Bill Text
4733306New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-49
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb49/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb49/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb49/PS/02/sb49_02_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb49/RH/03/sb49_03_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb49/PH/04/sb49_04_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb49/EN/05/sb49_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15629&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15824&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16363&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16365&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16575&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16719&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16956&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16984&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17031&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17139&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17222&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17299&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-49

Bill Comments

feedback