OH SB45 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: House State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: House State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.2514 of the Revised Code to designate the month of April as "Ohio Native Plant Month."
Title
Designate April as Ohio Native Plant Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2019-05-06 | House | Introduced |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced |